US HB6845 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the Department of Veterans Affairs from requiring a co-payment or other cost sharing for qualifying preventive services related to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019). A qualifying preventive service is intended to prevent or mitigate COVID-19 and is either (1) an evidence-based item or service with an A or B rating in the current recommendations of the U.S. Preventive Services Task Force, or (2) an immunization that has in effect a recommendation from the Advisory Committee on Immunization Practices of the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention with respect to the individual involved. Such a prohibition shall take effect 15 business days after the date on which a recommendation is made regarding a qualifying preventive service related to COVID-19.
Title
No Coronavirus Copays for Veterans Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2020-05-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2020-05-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
SB3724 (Same As) 2020-05-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB3724 (Same As) 2020-05-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health promotion and preventive care
Immunology and vaccination
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Veterans' medical care
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health promotion and preventive care
Immunology and vaccination
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6845/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6845/BILLS-116hr6845ih.pdf |