US HB6854 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Introduced on September 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hurricane Florence Tax Relief Act This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow various tax credits, deductions, and modifications to existing rules for individuals and businesses affected by Hurricane Florence. With respect to individuals and businesses in the affected areas, the bill: waives the 10% additional tax on early distributions from retirement plans for up to $100,000 in distributions made on or after September 13, 2018, and before January 1, 2020; permits individuals to recontribute funds to retirement plans if the funds were distributed for a home purchase in a Hurricane Florence disaster area that was cancelled on account of the hurricane; increases the limit and extends the repayment deadline for loans from retirement plans; allows an employee retention tax credit for a portion of the wages paid to an employee whose principal place of employment on specified dates was in a Hurricane Florence disaster zone; temporarily suspends the limitation on charitable contributions for relief efforts in the Hurricane Florence disaster area; modifies the rules for the deduction for personal casualty losses; and allows taxpayers to use earned income from the immediately preceding year for the purpose of determining earned income for the earned income tax credit and the child tax credit.
Title
Hurricane Florence Tax Relief Act
Sponsors
Rep. George Holding [R-NC] | Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] |
Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] | Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] |
Rep. Mark Walker [R-NC] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] | Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-09-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1892 (Related) 2018-02-09 - Became Public Law No: 115-123. (TXT | PDF)
HB3823 (Related) 2017-09-29 - Became Public Law No: 115-63. (TXT | PDF)
HB4397 (Related) 2017-11-15 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB4667 (Related) 2018-01-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 291.
SB1892 (Related) 2017-09-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB7166 (Related) 2018-11-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB3648 (Related) 2018-11-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB88 (Related) 2018-12-21 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate amendment.
HB3823 (Related) 2017-09-29 - Became Public Law No: 115-63. (TXT | PDF)
HB4397 (Related) 2017-11-15 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB4667 (Related) 2018-01-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 291.
SB1892 (Related) 2017-09-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB7166 (Related) 2018-11-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB3648 (Related) 2018-11-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB88 (Related) 2018-12-21 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate amendment.
Subjects
Charitable contributions
Disaster relief and insurance
Employee benefits and pensions
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Natural disasters
North Carolina
Poverty and welfare assistance
South Carolina
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax treatment of families
Taxation
Virginia
Wages and earnings
Disaster relief and insurance
Employee benefits and pensions
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Natural disasters
North Carolina
Poverty and welfare assistance
South Carolina
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax treatment of families
Taxation
Virginia
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6854/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6854/BILLS-115hr6854ih.pdf |