US HB6862 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Congressional Award Program Reauthorization Act of 2018 This bill amends the Congressional Award Act to reauthorize through FY2023 the Congressional Award Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Congressional Award Program Reauthorization Act of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-24HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
2018-09-24HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB4 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 401.
HB244 (Related) 2017-05-05 - Became Public Law No: 115-31. (TXT | PDF)
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HB6543 (Related) 2018-07-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SB3509 (Same As) 2018-10-11 - Became Public Law No: 115-268. (TXT | PDF)
HB302 (Related) 2018-10-05 - Became Public Law No: 115-254.
HR1082 (Related) 2018-09-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback