US HB6872 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services to distribute funds to allow states to establish strike teams that may be deployed to skilled nursing facilities and nursing facilities with cases of COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) to help with clinical care, infection control, or staffing.
Title
SOS Act of 2020 Sending Outside Support Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] |
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2020-05-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6698 (Related) 2020-05-05 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
SB3644 (Related) 2020-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
SB3644 (Related) 2020-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Nursing
Worker safety and health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Nursing
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6872/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6872/BILLS-116hr6872ih.pdf |