US HB6896 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-31 - Became Public Law No: 115-274.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-31 - Became Public Law No: 115-274.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
United States Parole Commission Extension Act of 2018
Title
United States Parole Commission Extension Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-31 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-274. |
2018-10-31 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-10-24 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-10-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-10-11 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-10-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6802-6803) |
2018-10-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2018-09-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-28 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9392-9393) |
2018-09-28 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9392-9393) |
2018-09-28 | House | Mr. Marino asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2018-09-28 | House | Committee on the Judiciary discharged. |
2018-09-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2018-09-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Government studies and investigations
Licensing and registrations
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Government studies and investigations
Licensing and registrations