US HB6901 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Federal CIO Authorization Act of 2018
Title
Federal CIO Authorization Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] |
Roll Calls
2018-11-30 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 425 (Y: 391 N: 0 NV: 41 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-11-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-11-30 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 391 - 0 (Roll no. 425). |
2018-11-30 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9747) |
2018-11-29 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Comer objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2018-11-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6901. |
2018-11-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9723-9725; text of measure as reported in House: CR H9723-9725) |
2018-11-29 | House | Mr. Comer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-10-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 771. |
2018-10-12 | House | Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-987. |
2018-09-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-09-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-09-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2018-09-26 | House | Introduced in House |