US HB6956 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Introduced on September 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-27 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Intern Opportunity Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Intern Opportunity Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-27HouseReferred to the House Committee on House Administration.
2018-09-27HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB10 (Related) 2017-07-13 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-108.
HB4074 (Related) 2017-10-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition.
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HB5785 (Related) 2018-05-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback