US HB7036 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-29 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 486.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-29 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 486.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permanently authorizes the Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act (ACPERA) of 2004. ACPERA provides incentives (e.g., limitations on civil liability) for corporations to self-report criminal conduct to the Antitrust Division within the Department of Justice. Currently, ACPERA expires on June 22, 2020.
Title
Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Permanent Extension Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Jim Jordan [R-OH] |
Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 486. |
2020-06-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-06-25 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H2439) |
2020-06-25 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H2439) |
2020-06-25 | House | Committee on the Judiciary discharged. |
2020-06-25 | House | Mr. Nadler asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2020-05-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-05-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3377 (Same As) 2020-06-29 - Held at the desk.
SB4346 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Held at the desk.
HB7882 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB8319 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Rule H. Res. 1129 passed House.
HR1129 (Similar To) 2020-09-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB8337 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Became Public Law No: 116-159. (TXT | PDF)
SB4346 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Held at the desk.
HB7882 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB8319 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Rule H. Res. 1129 passed House.
HR1129 (Similar To) 2020-09-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB8337 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Became Public Law No: 116-159. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Competition and antitrust
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Competition and antitrust
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation