US HB7080 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Health and Human Services to award grants to States, political subdivisions of States, Indian Tribes and Tribal organizations, community-based entities, and primary care and behavioral health organizations to address behavioral health needs caused by the public health emergency declared with respect to COVID-19.
Title
Stopping the Mental Health Pandemic Act
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA] |
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] |
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] |
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] | Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] | Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] |
Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2020-06-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2020-06-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2020-06-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
SB4059 (Related) 2020-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4059 (Related) 2020-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Community life and organization
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Internet and video services
Medical education
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Minority health
Performance measurement
Community life and organization
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Internet and video services
Medical education
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Minority health
Performance measurement
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7080/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7080/BILLS-116hr7080ih.pdf |