US HB7084 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize emergency rental voucher assistance, and for other purposes.
Title
Emergency Housing Voucher Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2020-06-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7301 (Related) 2020-06-30 - Received in the Senate.
HR1017 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB4164 (Related) 2020-07-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HR1017 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB4164 (Related) 2020-07-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Crime victims
Domestic violence and child abuse
Economic performance and conditions
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Housing supply and affordability
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Landlord and tenant
Public housing
Sex offenses
Crime victims
Domestic violence and child abuse
Economic performance and conditions
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Housing supply and affordability
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Landlord and tenant
Public housing
Sex offenses
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7084/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7084/BILLS-116hr7084ih.pdf |