US HB7092 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 218-36)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-04 - Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-04 - Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the National Parks and Public Land Legacy Restoration Fund to support deferred maintenance projects on federal lands. For FY2021-FY2025, there shall be deposited into the fund an amount equal to 50% of all federal revenues from the development of oil, gas, coal, or alternative or renewable energy on federal lands and waters. Deposited amounts must not exceed $1.9 billion for any fiscal year. The fund must be used for priority deferred maintenance projects in specified systems that are administered by the National Park Service, the Forest Service, the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, the Bureau of Land Management, and the Bureau of Indian Education. The Government Accountability Office must report on the effect of the fund in reducing the backlog of priority deferred maintenance projects for the specified agencies. Additionally, the bill makes funding for the Land and Water Conservation Fund (LWCF) permanent. The President shall annually report to Congress specified details regarding the allocation of funds to the LWCF. Congress may provide for alternate allocations using specified procedures.
Title
Great American Outdoors Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1957 (Same As) 2020-08-04 - Became Public Law No: 116-152. (TXT | PDF)
HB3195 (Related) 2019-11-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 222.
SB1081 (Related) 2020-02-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 429.
SB3422 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 438.
SB3684 (Related) 2020-05-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
HR1053 (Similar To) 2020-07-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB3195 (Related) 2019-11-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 222.
SB1081 (Related) 2020-02-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 429.
SB3422 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 438.
SB3684 (Related) 2020-05-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
HR1053 (Similar To) 2020-07-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Appropriations
Coal
Congressional oversight
Department of Agriculture
Department of the Interior
Disability and paralysis
Education programs funding
Energy revenues and royalties
Executive agency funding and structure
Forests, forestry, trees
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Hunting and fishing
Indian social and development programs
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Minority education
Oil and gas
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Securities
Transportation programs funding
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Appropriations
Coal
Congressional oversight
Department of Agriculture
Department of the Interior
Disability and paralysis
Education programs funding
Energy revenues and royalties
Executive agency funding and structure
Forests, forestry, trees
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Hunting and fishing
Indian social and development programs
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Minority education
Oil and gas
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Securities
Transportation programs funding
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7092/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7092/BILLS-116hr7092ih.pdf |