US HB7099 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 534.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 534.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs, if the Arizona Board of Regents (ABOR), on behalf of the University of Arizona Experiment Station, offers to convey to the United States all its interest in 7.5 acres of identified nonfederal land, the Department of Agriculture, in exchange, to convey to the ABOR all interest of the United States in 13.3 acres of land within the Coconino National Forest, in Yavapai County, Arizona, and an easement on Forest Service Road 9201D from its junction with Forest Service Road 0618 (commonly known as Beaver Creek).
Title
To provide for the conveyance of a small parcel of Coconino National Forest land in the State of Arizona.
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 534. |
2020-12-15 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-650. |
2020-09-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-09-30 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2020-06-18 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2020-06-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2020-06-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2020-06-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Arizona
Educational facilities and institutions
Forests, forestry, trees
Land transfers
Public lands and natural resources
Educational facilities and institutions
Forests, forestry, trees
Land transfers
Public lands and natural resources