US HB712 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 67-6)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Committee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

VA Medicinal Cannabis Research Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VA Medicinal Cannabis Research Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC]
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Don Young [R-AK]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]
Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]
Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]
Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]
Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]
Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]
Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]
Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]
Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]
Rep. Peter King [R-NY]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseCommittee Hearings Held.
2019-04-30HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-02-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-01-23HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2019-01-23HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E78)
2019-01-23HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback