US HB7147 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Community Mental Health Service Block Grant to authorize a set-aside for crisis care services, and for other purposes.
Title
Creating Resources to Improve Situations of Inherent Severity Act
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2020-06-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2020-06-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2020-06-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Subjects
Child health
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Hospital care
Mental health
State and local finance
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Hospital care
Mental health
State and local finance
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7147/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7147/BILLS-116hr7147ih.pdf |