US HB7153 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-1)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Law Enforcement Identification Act This bill requires federal law enforcement officers and members of the Armed Forces engaged in crowd control, riot control, or arrest or detainment of individuals engaged in an act of civil disobedience, demonstration, protest, or riot to display clearly visible identifying information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law Enforcement Identification Act

Sponsors

Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]
Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]
Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Justin Amash [R-MI]
Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]
Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]
Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]
Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-11HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-06-11HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-06-11HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB3909 (Same As) 2020-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB4220 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB7719 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback