US HB7159 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Community Mental Health Service Block Grant to authorize a set-aside for crisis care services, and for other purposes.
Title
Crisis Care Improvement and Suicide Prevention Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] | Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] |
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2020-06-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2020-06-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2020-06-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4282 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Child health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Mental health
State and local government operations
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Mental health
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7159/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7159/BILLS-116hr7159ih.pdf |