US HB7197 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 206-12)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-29 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2598-2599)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-29 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2598-2599)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Temporarily establishes and provides funding for the Restaurant Revitalization Fund, from which the Department of the Treasury shall make grants to eligible food and beverage purveyors to cover specified costs. The amount of such a grant shall be reduced by the amount of (1) any emergency grant received for an economic injury disaster loan, or (2) any paycheck protection loan amount forgiven under the Paycheck Protection Program established to support small businesses in response to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019). For the grant program's initial period, Treasury must (1) prioritize awarding grants to marginalized and underrepresented communities, and (2) only award grants to eligible food and beverage purveyors with annual revenues of less than $1.5 million.
Title
RESTAURANTS Act of 2020 Real Economic Support That Acknowledges Unique Restaurant Assistance Needed To Survive Act of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2598-2599) |
2020-06-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-15 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E538) |
2020-06-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4012 (Related) 2020-06-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4818 (Related) 2020-12-10 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
SB4818 (Related) 2020-12-10 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
Subjects
Appropriations
Business expenses
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Commerce
Economic performance and conditions
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Food industry and services
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government trust funds
Income tax exclusion
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Small business
Wages and earnings
Women in business
Business expenses
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Commerce
Economic performance and conditions
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Food industry and services
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government trust funds
Income tax exclusion
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Small business
Wages and earnings
Women in business
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7197/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7197/BILLS-116hr7197ih.pdf |