US HB720 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
States that with respect to the lapse in appropriations beginning on or around December 22, 2018, a federal employee who is excepted from furlough (i.e., who continues to work during the lapse in appropriations) and is not paid is eligible for unemployment compensation benefits.
Title
To deem Federal employees excepted from furlough during a Government shutdown in fiscal year 2019 to be eligible for unemployment compensation, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA] | Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] |
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] |
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] |
Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] | Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support. |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-01-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1117 (Related) 2019-02-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4072 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
HB4072 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
Subjects
Appropriations
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Unemployment
Wages and earnings
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Unemployment
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/720/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr720/BILLS-116hr720ih.pdf |