US HB7248 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Introduced on June 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize funds for Federal-aid highways, highway safety programs, and transit programs, and for other purposes.
Title
STARTER Act Surface Transportation Advanced through Reform, Technology, and Efficient Review Act
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] | Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] |
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Rob Woodall [R-GA] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] |
Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] |
Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] | Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] |
Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Ross Spano [R-FL] | Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV] |
Rep. Gregory Pence [R-IN] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2020-06-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2020-06-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4229 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1372 (Related) 2019-03-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
HB4919 (Related) 2019-10-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB5700 (Related) 2020-01-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB7130 (Related) 2020-06-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB7457 (Related) 2020-07-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
SB569 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1909 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB8510 (Related) 2020-10-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB8513 (Related) 2020-10-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB8579 (Related) 2020-10-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB8859 (Related) 2020-12-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB1372 (Related) 2019-03-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
HB4919 (Related) 2019-10-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB5700 (Related) 2020-01-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB7130 (Related) 2020-06-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB7457 (Related) 2020-07-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
SB569 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1909 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB8510 (Related) 2020-10-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB8513 (Related) 2020-10-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB8579 (Related) 2020-10-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB8859 (Related) 2020-12-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Subjects
Accidents
Accounting and auditing
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Air quality
Atmospheric science and weather
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Building construction
Civil actions and liability
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Commuting
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Department of Transportation
Disability assistance
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Economic development
Emergency communications systems
Emergency planning and evacuation
Employment and training programs
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental regulatory procedures
Fires
Floods and storm protection
Geography and mapping
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Intergovernmental relations
Internet and video services
Lakes and rivers
Licensing and registrations
Life, casualty, property insurance
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Motor carriers
Motor vehicles
Natural disasters
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Public transit
Public-private cooperation
Railroads
Regional and metropolitan planning
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Roads and highways
Rural conditions and development
Sales and excise taxes
Social security and elderly assistance
Solid waste and recycling
State and local government operations
Technology transfer and commercialization
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Urban and suburban affairs and development
User charges and fees
Water quality
Watersheds
Accounting and auditing
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Air quality
Atmospheric science and weather
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Building construction
Civil actions and liability
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Commuting
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Department of Transportation
Disability assistance
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Economic development
Emergency communications systems
Emergency planning and evacuation
Employment and training programs
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental regulatory procedures
Fires
Floods and storm protection
Geography and mapping
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Intergovernmental relations
Internet and video services
Lakes and rivers
Licensing and registrations
Life, casualty, property insurance
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Motor carriers
Motor vehicles
Natural disasters
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Public transit
Public-private cooperation
Railroads
Regional and metropolitan planning
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Roads and highways
Rural conditions and development
Sales and excise taxes
Social security and elderly assistance
Solid waste and recycling
State and local government operations
Technology transfer and commercialization
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Urban and suburban affairs and development
User charges and fees
Water quality
Watersheds
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7248/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7248/BILLS-116hr7248ih.pdf |