US HB7270 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Attorney General of the United States to submit to the Congress a report on Federal criminal offenses, and for other purposes.
Title
Count the Crimes to Cut Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Chip Roy [R-TX] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-06-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1893 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB697 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2850 (Related) 2019-11-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB697 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2850 (Related) 2019-11-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Government information and archives
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Government information and archives
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7270/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7270/BILLS-116hr7270ih.pdf |