US HB7276 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the President to establish an interagency working group to (1) coordinate the U.S. response to the ongoing desert locust outbreak in the East Africa region and its impact on food security and political stability, including in the context of restrictions relating to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019); (2) review the effectiveness of regional and multilateral efforts to eradicate the desert locust outbreak; and (3) develop and implement a plan to control the desert locust outbreak.
Title
East Africa Locust Eradication Act
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] |
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2020-11-18 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5895-5896) |
2020-11-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7276. |
2020-11-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5895-5897) |
2020-11-18 | House | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-07-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-07-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights, and International Organizations. |
2020-06-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2020-06-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Africa
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Federal officials
Food assistance and relief
Foreign aid and international relief
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Insects
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Pest management
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
World health
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Federal officials
Food assistance and relief
Foreign aid and international relief
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Insects
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Pest management
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
World health