US HB728 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 108-22-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Title VIII Nursing Workforce Reauthorization Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Title VIII Nursing Workforce Reauthorization Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. David McKinley [R-WV]Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]Rep. Don Young [R-AK]
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]
Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]
Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]
Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]
Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN]Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]
Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]
Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. John Katko [R-NY]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]
Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS]Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]
Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]
Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]
Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]
Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]
Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN]
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]
Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Peter King [R-NY]Rep. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK]
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]
Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR]
Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]
Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-29SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
2019-10-28HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-10-28HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8513-8514)
2019-10-28HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 728.
2019-10-28HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8513-8516)
2019-10-28HouseMs. Schakowsky moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-09-24HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 171.
2019-09-24HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-216.
2019-07-17HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-07-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-07-11HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
2019-07-11HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-01-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-01-23HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-01-23HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback