US HB7294 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Suspends payments and interest on Federal Perkins Loans through September 30, 2020. (Currently, payments and interest are suspended on certain Federal Direct Loans and Federal Family Education Loans through this period.) Specifically, the Department of Education (ED) must require holders of Federal Perkins Loans to (1) suspend the accrual of interest on such loans until September 30, 2020, and (2) confirm to ED that no interest has accrued on such loans as of March 13, 2020. ED must make suspended interest payments to holders of such loans on behalf of borrowers. Further, ED must require institutions of higher education to (1) suspend all payments due from borrowers through September 30, 2020; (2) suspend all involuntary collections; (3) notify borrowers, within 15 days, that their loan payments have been suspended and interest has been waived; and (4) carry out a program, beginning on August 1, 2020, to provide not fewer than six notices to borrowers that normal payment obligations will resume. Additionally, ED must deem each month for which a loan payment was suspended as if the borrower of the loan had made a payment for the purpose of any authorized loan forgiveness program or loan rehabilitation program, ensure that any suspended payment on such loan is treated as a regularly scheduled payment made by a borrower for the purpose of reporting information about the loan to a consumer reporting agency, and suspend involuntary collections related to such loans.
Title
COVID–19 Perkins Loan Relief Act
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] |
Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Debt collection
Education
Education programs funding
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Student aid and college costs
Wages and earnings
Debt collection
Education
Education programs funding
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Student aid and college costs
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7294/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7294/BILLS-116hr7294ih.pdf |