US HB7308 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 136-12)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
Pending: House Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
Pending: House Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Departments of Agriculture, Commerce, Defense, Education, Energy, the Interior, and Health and Human Services and the National Aeronautics and Space Administration (NASA), National Science Foundation, and Environmental Protection Agency to provide support for research regarding COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) or research disrupted by the COVID-19 pandemic. Support under this bill shall be provided through federal science agencies with at least $50 million in basic and applied research obligations in FY2020. Support may be used to provide supplemental funding to extend the duration of a grant to a research institution or national laboratory that was awarded prior to the enactment of this bill, or to expand the purposes of such a grant as specified; provide supplemental funding through existing competitively awarded cooperative agreements and contracts to cover the increased costs of construction of scientific facilities and equipment that have been delayed because of COVID-19; and award grants and cooperative agreements to institutions of higher education to conduct research on the behavioral, social, or economic effects of COVID-19 and the responses to the disease or on the effectiveness of such responses. Agencies must provide the support as rapidly as possible. Provided funds shall remain available for expenditure for up to two years.
Title
RISE Act Research Investment to Spark the Economy Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research. |
2020-07-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2020-07-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2020-06-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Armed Services, Education and Labor, Energy and Commerce, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Armed Services, Education and Labor, Energy and Commerce, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Armed Services, Education and Labor, Energy and Commerce, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Armed Services, Education and Labor, Energy and Commerce, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Armed Services, Education and Labor, Energy and Commerce, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Armed Services, Education and Labor, Energy and Commerce, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4286 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 639.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Defense spending
Department of Agriculture
Department of Commerce
Department of Defense
Department of Education
Department of Energy
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of the Interior
Education programs funding
Electric power generation and transmission
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Executive agency funding and structure
Health programs administration and funding
Higher education
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medical research
Military procurement, research, weapons development
National Aeronautics and Space Administration
National Science Foundation
Nuclear power
Oil and gas
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Science, technology, communications
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Defense spending
Department of Agriculture
Department of Commerce
Department of Defense
Department of Education
Department of Energy
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of the Interior
Education programs funding
Electric power generation and transmission
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Executive agency funding and structure
Health programs administration and funding
Higher education
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medical research
Military procurement, research, weapons development
National Aeronautics and Space Administration
National Science Foundation
Nuclear power
Oil and gas
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Science, technology, communications
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7308/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7308/BILLS-116hr7308ih.pdf |