US HB7320 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a small business performing a construction contract awarded by a federal agency to request an equitable adjustment if the agency's contracting officer directs a change in the work that is within the general scope of the contract without the agreement of the small business. The agency must provide the small business with an interim partial payment to cover additional costs resulting from such a change, and the small business must pay a first tier subcontractor or supplier the portion of the partial payment that is attributable to additional costs incurred due to the change.
Title
To amend the Small Business Act to require equitable adjustments to certain construction contracts, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2020-06-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2344 (Related) 2019-04-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB2853 (Related) 2019-11-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB2853 (Related) 2019-11-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7320/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7320/BILLS-116hr7320ih.pdf |