US HB7330 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide incentives for renewable energy and energy efficiency, and for other purposes.
Title
GREEN Act of 2020 Growing Renewable Energy and Efficiency Now Act of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2020-06-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
HB1507 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2040 (Related) 2019-04-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2256 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2313 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4887 (Related) 2019-10-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5156 (Related) 2019-11-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5157 (Related) 2019-11-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5159 (Related) 2019-11-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5161 (Related) 2019-11-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5162 (Related) 2019-11-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5163 (Related) 2019-11-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5165 (Related) 2019-11-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5166 (Related) 2019-11-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5167 (Related) 2019-11-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5168 (Related) 2019-11-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change.
HB7280 (Related) 2020-06-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1094 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1988 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1507 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2040 (Related) 2019-04-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2256 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2313 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4887 (Related) 2019-10-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5156 (Related) 2019-11-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5157 (Related) 2019-11-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5159 (Related) 2019-11-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5161 (Related) 2019-11-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5162 (Related) 2019-11-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5163 (Related) 2019-11-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5165 (Related) 2019-11-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5166 (Related) 2019-11-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5167 (Related) 2019-11-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5168 (Related) 2019-11-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change.
HB7280 (Related) 2020-06-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1094 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1988 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Commuting
Congressional oversight
Electric power generation and transmission
Employee benefits and pensions
Employee hiring
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental education
Environmental regulatory procedures
Floods and storm protection
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Housing industry and standards
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Labor standards
Licensing and registrations
Motor fuels
Motor vehicles
Pedestrians and bicycling
Property tax
Research administration and funding
Sales and excise taxes
State and local government operations
State and local taxation
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Wages and earnings
Water use and supply
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Commuting
Congressional oversight
Electric power generation and transmission
Employee benefits and pensions
Employee hiring
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental education
Environmental regulatory procedures
Floods and storm protection
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Housing industry and standards
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Labor standards
Licensing and registrations
Motor fuels
Motor vehicles
Pedestrians and bicycling
Property tax
Research administration and funding
Sales and excise taxes
State and local government operations
State and local taxation
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Wages and earnings
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7330/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7330/BILLS-116hr7330ih.pdf |