US HB7347 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-317.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-317.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the medical center of the Department of Veterans Affairs in Ann Arbor, Michigan, as the Lieutenant Colonel Charles S. Kettles Department of Veterans Affairs Medical Center or the Lieutenant Colonel Charles S. Kettles VA Medical Center.
Title
To designate the medical center of the Department of Veterans Affairs in Ann Arbor, Michigan, as the "Lieutenant Colonel Charles S. Kettles Department of Veterans Affairs Medical Center".
Sponsors
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] |
Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI] |
Rep. Justin Amash [R-MI] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] |
Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-05 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-317. |
2021-01-05 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-12-24 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-12-11 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7431) |
2020-09-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2020-09-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-23 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H4733) |
2020-09-23 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H4733) |
2020-09-23 | House | Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged. |
2020-09-23 | House | Mr. Takano asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2020-06-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2020-06-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4070 (Same As) 2020-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional tributes
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Health facilities and institutions
Michigan
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' medical care
Congressional tributes
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Health facilities and institutions
Michigan
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' medical care