US HB736 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-18 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 154.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-18 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 154.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Government Publishing Office (GPO) to establish and maintain a publicly available online portal containing copies of all congressionally mandated reports. A federal agency must submit a congressionally mandated report and specified information about the report to the GPO between 30 and 45 calendar days after submission of the report to either chamber or to any congressional committee or subcommittee. Upon the written request of the chair of a congressional committee or subcommittee to the GPO, a report submitted to that committee or subcommittee shall not be submitted or published on the portal. Federally chartered corporations and the Government Accountability Office are excluded from the requirements of this bill. The Office of Management and Budget must issue guidance to federal agencies on the bill's requirement for agencies to submit copies of congressionally mandated reports and related information to the GPO.
Title
Access to Congressionally Mandated Reports Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] |
Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] |
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Mark Walker [R-NC] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] |
Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] |
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] | Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 154. |
2019-07-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5951-5952) |
2019-07-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 736. |
2019-07-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5951-5953) |
2019-07-17 | House | Mr. Rouda moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
SB195 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 67.
HR172 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5150 (Related) 2019-12-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
SB195 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 67.
HR172 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5150 (Related) 2019-12-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Subjects
Congress
Congressional agencies
Congressional operations and organization
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government Publishing Office (GPO)
Legislative rules and procedure
Library of Congress
Congressional agencies
Congressional operations and organization
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government Publishing Office (GPO)
Legislative rules and procedure
Library of Congress