US HB7368 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-01 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3045-3046)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-01 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3045-3046)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 10, United States Code, to improve the process by which a member of the Armed Forces may be referred for a mental health evaluation.
Title
Brandon Act
Sponsors
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3045-3046) |
2020-06-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2020-06-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB4334 (Related) 2020-07-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB4334 (Related) 2020-07-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Military medicine
Military personnel and dependents
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Military medicine
Military personnel and dependents
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7368/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7368/BILLS-116hr7368ih.pdf |