US HB7425 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Introduced on June 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Federal Meat Inspection Act and the Poultry Products Inspection Act to allow for the interstate internet sales of certain State-inspected meat, and for other purposes.
Title
DIRECT Act Direct Interstate Retail Exemption for Certain Transactions Act
Sponsors
Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN] |
Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS] |
Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] | Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA] | Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX] |
Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture. |
2020-07-01 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2989) |
2020-06-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2020-06-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB8489 (Related) 2020-12-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
Subjects
Agriculture and food
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Internet and video services
Meat
Retail and wholesale trades
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Internet and video services
Meat
Retail and wholesale trades
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7425/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7425/BILLS-116hr7425ih.pdf |