US HB7445 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to expand eligibility for home loans from the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to certain members of the reserve components of the Armed Forces.
Title
To amend title 38, United States Code, to expand eligibility for home loans from the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to certain members of the reserve components of the Armed Forces.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] |
Rep. Tom Tiffany [R-WI] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] | Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2020-07-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-07-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-07-23 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2020-07-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2020-07-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4176 (Related) 2020-07-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB4511 (Related) 2020-12-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 603.
HB7952 (Related) 2020-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB4511 (Related) 2020-12-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 603.
HB7952 (Related) 2020-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Government lending and loan guarantees
Housing finance and home ownership
National Guard and reserves
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Government lending and loan guarantees
Housing finance and home ownership
National Guard and reserves
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7445/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7445/BILLS-116hr7445ih.pdf |