US HB7476 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Veterans Affairs to report on outreach activities regarding the potential exposure of veterans to certain herbicide agents utilized, stored, or tested by the military between May 1, 1945, and June 10, 1977, at sites outside of Vietnam. The report must indicate whether outreach activities are being conducted in Spanish.
Title
To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to submit a report to Congress on programs to notify veterans of potential exposure to certain herbicide agents outside of Vietnam, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2020-07-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2020-07-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Veterans' medical care
Vietnam
Congressional oversight
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Veterans' medical care
Vietnam
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7476/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7476/BILLS-116hr7476ih.pdf |