US HB7487 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To promote and support the local arts and creative economy in the United States.
Title
PLACE Act Promoting Local Arts and Creative Economy Workforce Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2020-09-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations. |
2020-07-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2020-07-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Financial Services, the Judiciary, Veterans' Affairs, Small Business, Ways and Means, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Financial Services, the Judiciary, Veterans' Affairs, Small Business, Ways and Means, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Financial Services, the Judiciary, Veterans' Affairs, Small Business, Ways and Means, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Financial Services, the Judiciary, Veterans' Affairs, Small Business, Ways and Means, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Financial Services, the Judiciary, Veterans' Affairs, Small Business, Ways and Means, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Financial Services, the Judiciary, Veterans' Affairs, Small Business, Ways and Means, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Financial Services, the Judiciary, Veterans' Affairs, Small Business, Ways and Means, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Financial Services, the Judiciary, Veterans' Affairs, Small Business, Ways and Means, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1793 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3121 (Related) 2019-06-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB3232 (Same As) 2020-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3121 (Related) 2019-06-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB3232 (Same As) 2020-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7487/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7487/BILLS-116hr7487ih.pdf |