US HB7516 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on July 9 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Clean Energy Innovation and Deployment Act of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clean Energy Innovation and Deployment Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-10HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
2020-07-10HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
2020-07-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-07-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-07-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-07-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-07-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-07-09HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Select Revenue Measures.
2020-07-09HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB2041 (Related) 2019-07-17 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
HB2096 (Related) 2019-04-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2256 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2986 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 379.
HB3473 (Related) 2019-06-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5527 (Related) 2020-01-09 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
SB1094 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1142 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1602 (Related) 2019-10-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 255.
SB1957 (Related) 2019-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3358 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.

Subjects

Accounting and auditing
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Aviation and airports
Civil actions and liability
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Coal
Congressional oversight
Credit and credit markets
Debt collection
Department of Energy
Electric power generation and transmission
Employee hiring
Employment and training programs
Energy
Energy assistance for the poor and aged
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Executive agency funding and structure
Floods and storm protection
Forests, forestry, trees
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Higher education
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Income tax credits
Infrastructure development
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Land use and conservation
Lighting, heating, cooling
Manufacturing
Motor vehicles
Nuclear power
Oil and gas
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Public utilities and utility rates
Research and development
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Science and engineering education
Securities
State and local government operations
Student aid and college costs
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Technology assessment
Technology transfer and commercialization
User charges and fees
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Vocational and technical education
Water quality
Wetlands

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback