US HB7524 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Introduced on July 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires each federal agency to take action to ensure that an individual is required to wear a face mask inside a federal facility under its jurisdiction if the individual is within six feet of another individual to minimize the transmission of COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019). Each agency shall make face masks available at each entrance to a federal facility at which such agency maintains a presence. The bill terminates such requirements when the National Institute of Allergy and Infectious Diseases determines, and publishes in the Federal Register a notification, that the requirement to wear a mask is no longer necessary to prevent such transmission.
Title
Wear Your Mask Act
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] |
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] |
Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL] |
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] |
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] | Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] |
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2020-07-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4610 (Related) 2020-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB4948 (Related) 2020-12-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4948 (Related) 2020-12-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Infectious and parasitic diseases
U.S. Capitol
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Infectious and parasitic diseases
U.S. Capitol
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7524/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7524/BILLS-116hr7524ih.pdf |