US HB753 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of State to establish a Global Electoral Exchange Program to promote sound election-administration practices around the world. The State Department may award grants to qualified, tax-exempt, U.S.-based organizations that have expertise and experience in relevant topics, such as election-system integrity. Grants may be used to design programs to bring relevant individuals, such as election administrators and poll workers, together to study and discuss election procedures. The State Department shall periodically report to Congress on the program's activities.
Title
Global Electoral Exchange Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2019-05-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-05-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3975) |
2019-05-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 753. |
2019-05-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3975-3976) |
2019-05-20 | House | Mr. Castro (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules. |
2019-04-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB324 (Related) 2019-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International organizations and cooperation
Research administration and funding
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International organizations and cooperation
Research administration and funding