US HB7550 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on July 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Departments of the Interior, Defense, and Veterans Affairs to each conduct a full inventory of specified Confederate commemorative works, including flags and other symbols or signage, on the public lands under their jurisdiction. Using such inventories, the National Park Service shall conduct a special resource study to examine the works commemorating and interpreting the Civil War and commemorating, with respect to such war, the soldiers, people on the home front and battle lines, and related locations in the United States from 1861 through 1865. Among contents required to be identified by the study are historical assessments of each work, the suitability and feasibility of retaining works, identification of properties that could meet the criteria for designation as national historic sites, and an evaluation of historical research.
Title
Confederate Commemorative Works Inventory and Joint Resource Study Act
Sponsors
Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2020-07-21 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2020-07-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2020-07-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Cemeteries and funerals
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Military facilities and property
Military history
Monuments and memorials
National symbols
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Military facilities and property
Military history
Monuments and memorials
National symbols
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7550/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7550/BILLS-116hr7550ih.pdf |