US HB756 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-7)
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-07 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-07 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Streamlining Energy Efficiency for Schools Act of 2015 This bill amends the Energy Policy and Conservation Act to direct the Department of Energy's Office of Energy and Renewable Energy to establish a clearinghouse to disseminate information regarding available programs and financing mechanisms that may be used to help initiate, develop, and finance energy efficiency, distributed generation, and energy retrofitting projects for schools. The Office must: (1) consult with appropriate agencies to develop a list of programs and financing mechanisms that are, or may be, used for the projects, and (2) coordinate with appropriate agencies to develop a collaborative education and outreach effort to streamline communications and promote the programs and financing mechanisms.
Title
Streamlining Energy Efficiency for Schools Act of 2015
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2016-12-06 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-12-06 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7190-7191) |
2016-12-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 756. |
2016-12-06 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7190-7192) |
2016-12-06 | House | Mr. Olson moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power. |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2015-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB720 (Related) 2015-09-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 210.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Building construction
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Government information and archives
Higher education
Building construction
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Government information and archives
Higher education