US HB7586 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Small Business Administration to allow any small business participating in its 8(a) Business Development program to extend participation by a period of one year. The 8(a) Business Development program limits competition for certain government contracts to small businesses that participate in the program.
Title
To temporarily extend participation in the 8(a) program of the Small Business Administration, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Ross Spano [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2020-07-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB7409 (Related) 2020-06-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
SB4818 (Related) 2020-12-10 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB7409 (Related) 2020-06-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
SB4818 (Related) 2020-12-10 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7586/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7586/BILLS-116hr7586ih.pdf |