US HB7597 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on July 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Defense (DOD) to report on all research being conducted or funded by DOD to assess the health effects of burn pits. The report must identify challenges to completing such research and must include recommendations to address those challenges.
Title
To direct the Secretary of Defense to submit to Congress a report on the research and studies being conducted or funded by the Department of Defense to assess the health effects of burn pits.
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2020-07-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB1790 (Similar To) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1790 (Similar To) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Fires
Government studies and investigations
Military medicine
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Solid waste and recycling
Congressional oversight
Fires
Government studies and investigations
Military medicine
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Solid waste and recycling
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7597/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7597/BILLS-116hr7597ih.pdf |