US HB7615 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on July 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows employers a payroll tax credit for 50% of the sum of qualified employee protection expenses, qualified workplace reconfiguration expenses, and qualified workplace technology expenses paid for each calendar quarter. The bill defines qualified employee protection expenses as the cost of testing employees for COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019), equipment to protect employees from COVID-19, and cleaning products or services for preventing the spread of COVID-19; qualified workplace reconfiguration expenses as amounts paid to design and reconfigure retail space, work areas, break areas, or other employee or customer areas for the primary purpose of preventing the spread of COVID-19, and such design and reconfiguration is completed pursuant to a plan in place before March 13, 2020, and completed before January 1, 2021; and qualified workplace technology expenses as amounts paid for technology systems that employees or customers use for the primary purpose of preventing the spread of COVID-19 and limiting physical contact, and is acquired after March 12, 2020, and placed in service before January 1, 2021.
Title
To provide a payroll tax credit for certain expenses associated with protecting employees from COVID-19.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC] | Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] |
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] |
Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] | Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] | Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] |
Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV] |
Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2020-07-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Select Revenue Measures. |
2020-07-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4214 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4318 (Related) 2020-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4537 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
SB4318 (Related) 2020-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4537 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Subjects
Appropriations
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Computers and information technology
Disability assistance
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employment taxes
Government trust funds
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Social security and elderly assistance
Taxation
Worker safety and health
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Computers and information technology
Disability assistance
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employment taxes
Government trust funds
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Social security and elderly assistance
Taxation
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7615/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7615/BILLS-116hr7615ih.pdf |