US HB762 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 208.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 208.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Energy's Office of Energy Efficiency and Renewable Energy to act as the lead agency for coordinating and disseminating information on existing programs and assistance that may be used to help initiate, develop, and finance energy efficiency, renewable energy, and energy retrofitting projects for schools.
Title
Streamlining Energy Efficiency for Schools Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA] |
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] |
Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] |
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] |
Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] |
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 208. |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-108. |
2019-07-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2019-03-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-03-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2328) |
2019-03-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 762. |
2019-03-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2328-2329) |
2019-03-05 | House | Mr. Tonko moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB253 (Related) 2019-09-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 207.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Building construction
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Government information and archives
Higher education
Building construction
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Government information and archives
Higher education