US HB7657 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides authority for the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers to carry out aquatic ecosystem restoration projects to improve habitat or passage for anadromous fish, including (1) installing fish bypass structures on small water diversions, (2) modifying tide gates, and (3) restoring or reconnecting floodplains and wetlands that are important for anadromous fish habitat or passage. Anadromous fish are species of fish that spawn in fresh or estuarine waters and that migrate to ocean waters. The Corps must give such projects equal priority for implementation as other aquatic ecosystem restoration projects.
Title
To amend the Water Resources Development Act of 1996 with respect to anadromous fish habitat and passage, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2020-07-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7575 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Received in the Senate.
SB1811 (Related) 2020-12-09 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
SB1811 (Related) 2020-12-09 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
Subjects
Aquatic ecology
Fishes
Lakes and rivers
Public lands and natural resources
Wetlands
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Fishes
Lakes and rivers
Public lands and natural resources
Wetlands
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7657/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7657/BILLS-116hr7657ih.pdf |