US HB7683 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Commerce to provide grants for public works and economic development projects that will directly or indirectly increase the accessibility of affordable, quality child care, including grants for planning, and training, research, and technical assistance related to such projects. Commerce must issue regulations to establish criteria for whether a project directly or indirectly increases the accessibility of affordable, quality child care. Such criteria shall consider (1) the availability, validity, and accessibility of timely data, (2) the extent to which a project contributes to a family's financial security, and (3) the extent to which a project addresses child care needs in child care deserts or areas otherwise recognized as being in shortage. A child care desert is an area in which the number of children who are under age five is more than three times the number of slots provided by child care providers who are licensed or registered by the state involved, or a community that the state or tribal entity involved determines has a low supply of quality, affordable child care. Commerce must also issue guidance on how to include the accessibility of affordable, quality child care in a comprehensive economic development strategy.
Title
ACCESS Act Affordable Child Care for Economic Strategies and Success Act
Sponsors
Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] | Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2020-07-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4383 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB8326 (Related) 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB8326 (Related) 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Child care and development
Department of Commerce
Economic development
Employment and training programs
Government lending and loan guarantees
Transportation and public works
Child care and development
Department of Commerce
Economic development
Employment and training programs
Government lending and loan guarantees
Transportation and public works
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7683/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7683/BILLS-116hr7683ih.pdf |