US HB7687 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on July 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses firefighter and veteran exposure to perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances, commonly referred to as PFAS. These substances are man-made and may have adverse human health effects. A variety of products contain the compounds (e.g., weatherproof clothing). The bill authorizes the use of pre-disaster hazard mitigation funding for the remediation of PFAS at fire training facilities. The National Institute of Standards and Technology in the Department of Commerce must commence a study and report on the contents and composition of new and unused personal protective equipment worn by firefighters in relation to PFAS. For certain conditions associated with exposure to PFAS, the bill provides eligibility for Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) hospital care and medical services to veterans who served on active duty at military installations at which individuals were exposed to PFAS. Service by veterans as reservists or civilian firefighters shall be considered active duty service for eligibility purposes if such service occurred during a period specified by the VA on the applicable military installations. The bill also provides eligibility for VA hospital care and medical services for exposure-related conditions to the family members of such veterans and civilian firefighters. The bill establishes a presumption of service-connection for specified illnesses or diseases related to PFAS exposure that manifest in veterans (including reservists or veterans serving as civilian firefighters) who served on active duty at a military installation where they were exposed to PFAS. Under a presumption of service-connection, specific conditions diagnosed in certain veterans are presumed to have been caused by the circumstances of their military service. Health care benefits and disability compensation may then be awarded.
Title
Protecting Firefighters from PFAS Act
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2020-07-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2102 (Related) 2019-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1023 (Related) 2019-04-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB7560 (Related) 2020-07-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
SB1023 (Related) 2019-04-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB7560 (Related) 2020-07-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
Subjects
Cancer
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Disability and paralysis
Emergency planning and evacuation
Environmental health
Environmental protection
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health care coverage and access
Hospital care
Military facilities and property
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Product safety and quality
Research administration and funding
Technology assessment
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Worker safety and health
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Disability and paralysis
Emergency planning and evacuation
Environmental health
Environmental protection
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health care coverage and access
Hospital care
Military facilities and property
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Product safety and quality
Research administration and funding
Technology assessment
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7687/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7687/BILLS-116hr7687ih.pdf |