US HB7690 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Introduced on July 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Agriculture (USDA) to make payments to a timber harvesting business or timber hauling business that, as a result of the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) pandemic, experienced a loss of not less than 10% in gross revenue during the period beginning on January 1, 2020, and ending on July 31, 2020, as compared to its gross revenue during the same period in 2019. The amount of a payment made to an eligible entity shall be equal to 10% of the gross revenue of the business during the period beginning on January 1, 2019, and ending on July 31, 2019. USDA shall make such a payment only to a business that certifies that the payment will be used only for operating expenses.
Title
To establish a payment program for unexpected loss of markets and revenues to timber harvesting and timber hauling businesses due to the COVID-19 pandemic, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] |
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Ralph Abraham [R-LA] | Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC] | Rep. Tom Tiffany [R-WI] |
Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS] | Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS] | Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] |
Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] |
Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] |
Rep. William Timmons [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2020-07-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2020-07-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4233 (Related) 2020-07-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4350-4351)
Subjects
Appropriations
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Department of Agriculture
Economic performance and conditions
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Executive agency funding and structure
Forests, forestry, trees
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Public lands and natural resources
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Department of Agriculture
Economic performance and conditions
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Executive agency funding and structure
Forests, forestry, trees
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Public lands and natural resources
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7690/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7690/BILLS-116hr7690ih.pdf |