US HB770 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-197.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-197.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
American Innovation $1 Coin Act (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of the Treasury, over a 14-year period beginning in 2019, to mint and issue "American Innovation" $1 coins commemorating innovation and innovators from each state, each U.S. territory, and the District of Columbia. Such coins shall be issued in the order in which the states ratified the Constitution or were admitted into the Union. After all such coins are issued, coins shall be issued for the District of Columbia and the territories. Treasury shall issue four coins per year until a coin has been issued for each jurisdiction. Neither the bust of any person nor the portrait of any living person may be included in the design of the coins. The bill instructs Interior to continue to mint and issue $1 coins honoring Native Americans and their contributions.
Title
American Innovation $1 Coin Act
Sponsors
Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] |
Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] |
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] |
Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Jason Lewis [R-MN] | Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] |
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R-OH] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Charles Dent [R-PA] |
Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-20 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-197. |
2018-07-20 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-07-10 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H5786-5787) |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Mr. Hensarling asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H5786-5787) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S4293) |
2018-06-20 | Senate | S.Amdt.3041 Amendment SA 3041 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | S.Amdt.3041 Amendment SA 3041 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Murphy. (consideration: CR S4293; text: CR S4293) To improve the bill. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4293) |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2018-01-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-01-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H181-182) |
2018-01-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 770. |
2018-01-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H181-183) |
2018-01-16 | House | Mr. Duffy moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-01-31 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1326 (Related) 2017-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB2399 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB2399 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.