US HB7718 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-6)
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To address the health needs of incarcerated women related to pregnancy and childbirth, and for other purposes.
Title
Protecting the Health and Wellness of Babies and Pregnant Women in Custody Act
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] | Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] |
Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] |
Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] |
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] |
Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] |
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] |
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] |
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] |
Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-10-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-10-01 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5143-5147) |
2020-10-01 | House | DEBATE - The House continued with debate on H.R. 7718. |
2020-10-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7718. |
2020-10-01 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5143-5149) |
2020-10-01 | House | Ms. Bass moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 436. |
2020-09-24 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-536. |
2020-09-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-07-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-07-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Child care and development
Child health
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Cosmetics and personal care
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Debt collection
Department of Justice
Detention of persons
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Employment and training programs
Family services
Food assistance and relief
Government Accountability Office (GAO)
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health promotion and preventive care
HIV/AIDS
Hospital care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Judicial procedure and administration
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Nutrition and diet
Poverty and welfare assistance
Sexually transmitted diseases
State and local government operations
Women's health
Child care and development
Child health
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Cosmetics and personal care
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Debt collection
Department of Justice
Detention of persons
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Employment and training programs
Family services
Food assistance and relief
Government Accountability Office (GAO)
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health promotion and preventive care
HIV/AIDS
Hospital care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Judicial procedure and administration
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Nutrition and diet
Poverty and welfare assistance
Sexually transmitted diseases
State and local government operations
Women's health