US HB7719 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 67-0)
Status: Introduced on July 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes limitations on federal law enforcement officers and members of the Armed Forces (or the National Guard) engaging in law enforcement activities related to crowd control. When engaged in certain law enforcement activities related to crowd control, such an officer or member (1) shall clearly display certain identifying information, such as the individual's last name or unique identifier; and (2) shall not use an unmarked vehicle to apprehend or arrest civilians. Such an officer or member may only engage in certain law enforcement activities, such as crowd or riot control and arrest of individuals engaged in civil disobedience, on or in the immediate vicinity of federal property, unless (1) a state or local government has requested federal support, or (2) the President has invoked certain authorities to suppress insurrection. If such an officer or member is conducting a law enforcement function in violation of the limitations in this bill, the officer or member may not arrest an individual in the United States. If such an officer or member is deployed to respond to any riot, public disturbance, or crowd control incident, the responsible federal agency or branch of the Armed Forces shall, within 24 hours of the deployment, notify the public and provide certain information on its website.
Title
Preventing Authoritarian Policing Tactics on America’s Streets Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7153 (Related) 2020-06-11 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3909 (Related) 2020-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB4220 (Same As) 2020-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3909 (Related) 2020-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB4220 (Same As) 2020-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Detention of persons
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Military civil functions
Military personnel and dependents
Protest and dissent
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Detention of persons
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Military civil functions
Military personnel and dependents
Protest and dissent
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7719/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7719/BILLS-116hr7719ih.pdf |