US HB776 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-22 - Became Public Law No: 116-49. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-22 - Became Public Law No: 116-49. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2024 the Emergency Medical Services for Children Program, which is a grant program administered by the Health Resources and Services Administration. The program focuses on improving emergency health care for children who are seriously ill or injured.
Title
Emergency Medical Services for Children Program Reauthorization Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME] |
Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] |
Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] | Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-22 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-49. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-08-22 | House | Signed by President. |
2019-08-13 | House | Presented to President. |
2019-08-01 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5275) |
2019-07-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2019-07-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7364) |
2019-07-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 776. |
2019-07-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7364-7365) |
2019-07-24 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-07-23 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 136. |
2019-07-23 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-176. |
2019-07-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-07-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-11 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2019-07-11 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-25 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1173 (Related) 2019-07-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 137.
Subjects
Child health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health programs administration and funding
State and local finance
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health programs administration and funding
State and local finance